This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/22/2018 at 06:48:20 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF SYNCHRONY BANK FKA GE CAPITAL RETAIL BANK VS RITA RODRIGUEZ AKA RITA C RODRIGUEZ

Case Summary

On 10/20/2016 CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF SYNCHRONY BANK FKA GE CAPITAL RETAIL BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against RITA RODRIGUEZ AKA RITA C RODRIGUEZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Etienne, Linda S. and Holladay, Brandon. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5747

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Etienne, Linda S.

Holladay, Brandon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF SYNCHRONY BANK FKA GE CAPITAL RETAIL BANK

Defendant

RITA RODRIGUEZ AKA RITA C RODRIGUEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JENSEN, CASEY M

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 02/27/2017: Judicial Officer: Holladay, Brandon; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 04/13/2017: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Cont'd from 02/27/17; Parties Present Defendant: RITA RODRIGUEZ AKA RITA C RODRIGUEZ

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2017
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: re: imposition of sanctions for failing to comply with CRC, Rule 3.740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • Request for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: without prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • Notice of Hearing - Comment: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE TO PLAINTIFF; 6/15/17, 830AM, DEPT 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Conference 04/13/2017: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Cont'd from 02/27/17; Parties Present Defendant: RITA RODRIGUEZ AKA RITA C RODRIGUEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Conference 02/27/2017: Judicial Officer: Holladay, Brandon; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • Answer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • Proof of Service - Comment: AS TO RITA RODRIGUEZ,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less