This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 05/15/2020 at 07:23:27 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF SYNCHRONY BANK FKA GE CAPITAL RETAIL BANK VS JESUS MORALES AKA JESUS MORALES JR.

Case Summary

On 01/02/2020 CAVALRY SPV I, LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF SYNCHRONY BANK FKA GE CAPITAL RETAIL BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JESUS MORALES AKA JESUS MORALES JR. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Arvin / Lamont Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Witt, Gary R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0001

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arvin / Lamont Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Witt, Gary R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Cavalry Spv I, Llc, As Assignee Of Synchrony Bank Fka Ge Capital Retail Bank,

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF SYNCHRONY BANK FKA GE CAPITAL RETAIL BANK

Defendants

Morales, Jesus

JESUS MORALES AKA JESUS MORALES JR.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOALST, LAURA M

 

Court Documents

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F):

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21):

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F):

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21):

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F): Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Comment: RE: DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed; Comment: RE: PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Settlement - Conditional - Comment: Notice of Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: Answer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO JESUS MORALES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF SYNCHRONY BANK FKA GE CAPITAL RETAIL BANK; Served: 01/08/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Re: Venue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.