This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 03:35:09 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF SYNCHRONY BANK FKA GE CAPITAL RETAIL BANK VS JUAN DORANATES AKA JUAN JOSE M DORANATES AKA JUAN JOSE DORANATES AKA JUAN M DORANATES

Case Summary

On 06/27/2016 CAVALRY SPV I, LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF SYNCHRONY BANK FKA GE CAPITAL RETAIL BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JUAN DORANATES AKA JUAN JOSE M DORANATES AKA JUAN JOSE DORANATES AKA JUAN M DORANATES. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Delano / Mcfarland Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Tafoya, Robert S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0176

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delano / Mcfarland Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Tafoya, Robert S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF SYNCHRONY BANK FKA GE CAPITAL RETAIL BANK

Defendant

JUAN DORANATES AKA JUAN JOSE M DORANATES AKA JUAN JOSE DORANATES AKA JUAN M DORANATES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WINN, BRIAN N

ZELLER, STEPHEN S

HOALST, LAURA M

GORDON, JOHN E

JENSEN, CASEY M

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: File & Serve. Request for Dismissal on Does and Declaration & Order rejected.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2019
  • DocketMemorandum of Credits, Interest and Costs Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: San Bernardino County

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • DocketWrit Returned Unsatisfied - Comment: Kern County

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • DocketMemorandum of Credits, Interest and Costs Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: Kern County

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Stipulated Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF SYNCHRONY BANK FKA GE CAPITAL RETAIL BANK; Awarded Against: JUAN DORANATES AKA JUAN JOSE M DORANATES AKA JUAN JOSE DORANATES AKA JUAN M DORANATES; Amount; Damages: $748.31; Costs: $300.00; Total: $1048.31; Party: Names: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF SYNCHRONY BANK FKA GE CAPITAL RETAIL BANK; JUAN DORANATES AKA JUAN JOSE M DORANATES AKA JUAN JOSE DORANATES AKA JUAN M DORANATES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • DocketJudgment (After Conditional Settlement) - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • DocketDeclaration for Default - Comment: In Payments

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • DocketDeclaration and Order - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Comment: To Accept Copy as the Originals

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 09/02/2016
  • DocketNotice of Order to Appear

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • DocketNotice of Settlement Conditional (JBSIS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2016
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2016
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF SYNCHRONY BANK FKA GE CAPITAL RETAIL BANK; Served: 07/08/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jensen, Casey M

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WINN BRIAN N. ESQ.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GORDON JOHN E.