This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 06:11:59 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF SYNCHRONY BANK FKA GE CAPITAL RETAIL BANK VS CHAPMAN, ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/29/2016 CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF SYNCHRONY BANK FKA GE CAPITAL RETAIL BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CHAPMAN. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Stainfield, Bryan K. and Green, Kenneth R., Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0405

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Stainfield, Bryan K.

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF SYNCHRONY BANK FKA GE CAPITAL RETAIL BANK

Defendants

GREGORY CHAPMAN AKA GREGORY A CHAPMAN

CHAPMAN, GREGORY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZELLER, STEPHEN S

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketMemorandum of Credits, Interest and Costs Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: COUNTY OF KERN - RETURNED VIA E-FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: Kern County. E-file

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • DocketMemorandum of Credits, Interest and Costs Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • DocketAbstract Issued - Comment: . Mail to Winn Law Group

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF SYNCHRONY BANK FKA GE CAPITAL RETAIL BANK; Awarded Against: GREGORY CHAPMAN AKA GREGORY A CHAPMAN; Amount; Damages: $2,226.25; Costs: $330.00; Total: $2556.25; Party: Names: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF SYNCHRONY BANK FKA GE CAPITAL RETAIL BANK; CHAPMAN, GREGORY; GREGORY CHAPMAN AKA GREGORY A CHAPMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Comment: ----------COPY OF JUDGMENT MAILED TO WINN LAW GROUP ON 7-31-17-------

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: RE ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS AND/OR LOST INSTRUMENT AND ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 1788.60(A)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/28/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: AGAINST DOES 1 TO 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default by Court Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: as to Gregory Chapman aka Gregory A. Chapman

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.