Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/17/2018 at 19:20:45 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF HSBC BANK NEVADA, N.A. VS MARTINEZ

Case Summary

On 07/10/2015 CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF HSBC BANK NEVADA, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MARTINEZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1028

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF HSBC BANK NEVADA, N.A.

Defendant

MARTINEZ, ARTURO K

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZELLER, STEPHEN S

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF HSBC BANK NEVADA, N.A.; Awarded Against: MARTINEZ, ARTURO K; Amount; Damages: $829.41; Costs: $280.00; Total: $1109.41

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • Writ Returned Unsatisfied Pursuant to CCP 263.6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • Abstract Issued - Comment: ISSUED/DKR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • Writ of Execution Issued - Comment: COUNTY OF KERN RETURNED VIA ENCLOSED ENVELOPE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • Memorandum of Credits, Interest and Costs Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ENCLOSED ENVELOPE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • Writ of Execution Issued - Comment: LOS ANGELES/ MONEY/ WES, RETURNED VIA S.A.S.E.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2015
  • Memorandum of Costs - Comment: RETURNED VIA S.A.S.E.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • Judgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 10/13/2015
  • Declaration - Comment: Re: Adjustment of Amount Prayed in Complaint for Common Counts

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2015
  • Request for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment - Comment: as to Arturo K MArtinez AKA Arturo Martinez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2015
  • Request for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: as to Does 1-10 Only.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2015
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: substituted, as to Arturo K Martinez aka Arturo Martinez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA PREPAID ENVELOPE LEGAL EXPRESS LIMITED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Complaint - Comment: FILED BY STEPHEN S. ZELLER

    Read MoreRead Less