Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 07/11/2021 at 20:12:57 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF DEPARTMENT STORES NATIONAL BANK VS GUERRERO

Case Summary

On 10/14/2020 CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF DEPARTMENT STORES NATIONAL BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GUERRERO. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4489

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF DEPARTMENT STORES NATIONAL BANK

Defendant

GUERRERO, TANYA R

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SWEARINGEN-OJURI, AMBER I.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F):

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21):

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF DEPARTMENT STORES NATIONAL BANK; Awarded Against: GUERRERO, TANYA R; Amount; Damages: $2,007.29; Costs: $245.00; Total: $2252.29

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: Against Tanya R Guerrero

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketDeclaration and Order - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: Granting the use of copies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Re: Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Re: Copies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Re: 1788.60

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Re: 1033

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: Without prejudice as to Does 1-10

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketRequest For Entry of Default Not Entered - Comment: 1a Does not conform to the Complaint.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 10/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Re:Reduced Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SWEARINGEN-OJURI, AMBER