This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 10/26/2020 at 09:34:12 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK, N.A. VS VILLALOBOS

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against VILLALOBOS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Arvin / Lamont Branch located in Kern, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0072

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arvin / Lamont Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK, N.A.

Defendant

VILLALOBOS, RAMON BAEZA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARSHALL, AMY

 

Court Documents

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F):

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21):

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F): Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Comment: RE: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed; Comment: RE: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK, N.A.; Served: 09/29/20206:22 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less