This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 21:12:02 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK, N.A. VS RAMIREZ

Case Summary

On 09/29/2017 CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against RAMIREZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5762

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK, N.A.

Defendant

PATRICIA S RAMIREZ AKA PATRICIA RAMIREZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BURROWS, JASON M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK, N.A.; Awarded Against: PATRICIA S RAMIREZ AKA PATRICIA RAMIREZ; Amount; Damages: $2,046.11; Costs: $300.00; Total: $2346.11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: as to Patricia S Ramirez AKA Patricia Ramirez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • DocketDeclaration and Order - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: Granting use of copies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: declaration in support of application of entry of judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketDeclaration of Compliance with CCP Section 1033 (B) (2) - Comment: declaration in support of judment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: AS TO DOES, WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Court Judgment - Comment: AS TO PATRICIA S RAMIREZ AKA PATRICIA RAMIREZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: AS TO PATRICIA S RAMIREZ, SUB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 10/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.