This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 09/21/2021 at 20:25:35 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK, N.A., VS MARTINEZ

Case Summary

On 10/14/2020 CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MARTINEZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4490

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK, N.A.,

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK, N.A.

Defendant

MARTINEZ, ADRIANA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARSHALL, AMY

 

Court Documents

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F):

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21):

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Not Entered - Comment: Judgment entered on 4/2/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK, N.A.,; Awarded Against: MARTINEZ, ADRIANA; Amount; Damages: $2,645.11; Costs: $245.00; Total: $2890.11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: Against Adriana Martinez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketDeclaration and Order - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: Granitng the use of copies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Re: Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Re: Copies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Re: 1788.60

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Re: 1033

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketRequest For Entry of Default Not Entered - Comment: 1a does not conform to the Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 11/01/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Re: Reduced Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARSHALL AMY