This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 11/22/2020 at 08:50:34 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK, N.A. VS KING

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against KING. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4037

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK, N.A.

Defendant

KING, RANDY P

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCGAFFEY, DAVID C.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F):

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21):

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Re: Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less