This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 10:51:46 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A., VS MARY F FLORES AKA MARY FLORES

Case Summary

On 10/06/2016 CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF CAPITAL ONE BANK USA , N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MARY F FLORES AKA MARY FLORES. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Etienne, Linda S. and Robertson, Murray J.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5434

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Etienne, Linda S.

Robertson, Murray J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.,

Defendants

MARY F FLORES AKA MARY FLORES

FLORES, MARY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GORDON, JOHN E

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: RE: Judgment After Trial

Jury Trial

Jury Trial 09/13/2018: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Brian winn Re: Case Management Statement Reason: Case management statement is not the appropriate document for hearing scheduled. Please submit pre-trial documents accordingly. Thank you

Trial Setting Conference

OSC/Trial Setting Conference 12/04/2017: Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Defendant: FLORES, MARY

Trial Setting Conference

Trial Setting Conference 10/02/2017: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: cont'd from 08/24/17 and 08/31/17

Trial Setting Conference

Trial Setting Conference 08/31/2017: Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Cont'd from 08/24/17

Motion (Pre-Disposition)

Motion (Pre-Disposition) 08/31/2017: Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Notice of and Motion to Deem Facts

Trial Setting Conference

Trial Setting Conference 08/24/2017: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

Ruling

Ruling 06/28/2017: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 05/01/2017: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Cont'd from 01/30/17; Parties Present Defendant: FLORES, MARY

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 01/30/2017: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Defendant: FLORES, MARY

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2019
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: KERN COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order After Court Trial; Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.,; Awarded Against: MARY F FLORES AKA MARY FLORES; FLORES, MARY; Amount; Damages: $3,104.60; Costs: $370.30; Total: $3474.90

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketJudgment after Trial - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs - Comment: Memorandum of Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: RE: Judgment After Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinal Case Management Conference - Jury Trial 09/13/2018: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJury Trial - Jury Trial 09/13/2018: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • DocketOrder on Motion - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: to deem facts as admitted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • DocketNotice of Ruling - Comment: HRG 8/31/17 notice of ruling on Plantiff's Motion to Deem

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 10/31/2016
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2016
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Comment: BY CLERK AS TO MARY FLORES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2016
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: AS TO MARY FLORES,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 10/20/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less