This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/04/2020 at 19:42:01 (UTC).

CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES, LLC VS ALFREDO G MORENO, ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/15/2004 CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ALFREDO G MORENO,. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Arvin / Lamont Branch located in Kern, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4523

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES, LLC

Defendant

MORENO, ALFREDO G

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SIMS, RALPH L

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2008
  • DocketWrit Returned and Filed - Comment: WHOLLY SATISFIED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2006
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Full Satisfaction - Comment:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2005
  • DocketMemorandum of Credits, Interest and Costs Filed - Comment:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2005
  • Docket115 Pmt: Writs Issued GC 26828 - Comment: Amount of $7.00 for CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES, LLC (PL-1). Received from LAW OFFICES OF WINN AND SIMS, check no(s) 152725. Receipt #186497 for amount of $7.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2005
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: KERN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2005
  • DocketAbstract Issued - Comment:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2005
  • Docket117 Pmt: Abstract Issued / GC 26834 - Comment: Amount of $7.00 for CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES, LLC (PL-1). Received from CAVALRY PORTFOLIO, check no(s) 123558. Receipt #153409 for amount of $7.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2005
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Clerk - Comment: JUDGMENT FOR: CAVALRY PORTFOLIO JUDGMENT AGAINST: ALFREDO G. MORENO ATTORNEY FEES $ COSTS $ INTERESTS $598.32 TOTAL $ 1,925.56 RECORDED: DOCUMENT NO: PAGE(S):

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2005
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: RE:UNDERLYING ACTION OF OPEN BOOK ACCOUNT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2005
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: OF BRIAN N. WINN IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 02/09/2005
  • DocketDefault Entered as Requested On - Comment: DATE: 02/08/05 PARTY: AGAINST ALFREDO G. MORENO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2005
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment - Comment:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2004
  • DocketDeclaration of Due Diligence Filed - Comment:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2004
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: MAIL/PERSONAL: MAIL ON 11/12/04 NAME OF DOCUMENT: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF CMC, ETC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2004
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: WHAT SERVED: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF CMC, ETC. PARTY SERVED: ALFREDO G. MORENO BY SUBSTITUTE SERVICE IN THE PRESENCE OF JANE DOE AN OCCUPANT AND SISTER DATE OF SERVICE: ON 11/11/04 AT 6:28AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2004
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference - Comment: New Notice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2004
  • DocketSummons Issued - Comment:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2004
  • DocketComplaint - Comment:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2004
  • Docket843C Pmt: Ltd Civil Complaint < $10,000 (1/1/04) - Comment: Amount of $145.30 for CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES, LLC (PL-1). Received from LAW OFFICES OF WINN AND SIMS, check no(s) 101428. Receipt #127652 for amount of $145.30.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2004
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 238

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF GMAC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SIMS RALPH L