This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/07/2021 at 13:41:25 (UTC).

CATHERINE ALDINE SHELTON DECEASED

Case Summary

On 01/30/2020 CATHERINE ALDINE SHELTON DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kendall, Andrew. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2095

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kendall, Andrew

 

Party Details

Petitioners

SIMMONS, PATRICIA

SHELTON, JOHN PHILLIP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

STROH, HERBERT A

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Petition to Determine; returned via envelope provided

Ruling

Ruling 03/26/2020: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Petition to Determine Succession

Petition to Determine Succession 09/24/2020: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NOTES - 1. Petitioners filed (#1 and throughout) and signed petition in an individual capacity. Petition should be filed in the capacity of personal representative of the decedent's estate pursuant to Supplement filed 09/16/20. 2. Number 13 states specific interest is 100%. Pursuant to Supplement filed 09/16/20, petitioners were appointed personal representatives of the decedent's estate in The Shelby Superior Court of Indiana, County of Shelby. Number 13 should be to the estate of the decedent (Indiana).

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Proposed order; returned via file&serve

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketOrder Determining Succession - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Proposed order; returned via file&serve

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition to Determine Succession - Petition to Determine Succession 09/24/2020: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NOTES - 1. Petitioners filed (#1 and throughout) and signed petition in an individual capacity. Petition should be filed in the capacity of personal representative of the decedent's estate pursuant to Supplement filed 09/16/20. 2. Number 13 states specific interest is 100%. Pursuant to Supplement filed 09/16/20, petitioners were appointed personal representatives of the decedent's estate in The Shelby Superior Court of Indiana, County of Shelby. Number 13 should be to the estate of the decedent (Indiana).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketVerification - Comment: Verification of John Shelton to First Supplement to Petition to Determine Succession to Real Property as Filed on September 18, 2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketNotice - Comment: Notice of Appearance by CourtCall

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketSupplement - Comment: First Supplement to Petition to Determine Succession to Real Property

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: Notice of Continued Hearing - Decedent's Estate or Trust

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling 03/26/2020: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: 04/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketPetition to Determine Succession - Comment: Petition to Determine Succession to Real Property

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Petition to Determine; returned via envelope provided

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer STROH, HERBERT A.