This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 11/23/2020 at 08:49:36 (UTC).

CASTILLO VS MALPARTIDA VILLAVICONCIO

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 CASTILLO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MALPARTIDA VILLAVICONCIO. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lampe, David R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2230

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CASTILLO, DANIEL

Defendants

MALPARTIDA VILLAVICONCIO, DAVID E.

MALPARTIDA VILLAVICENCIO, DAVID E

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HALL, JOHN C

Defendant Attorney

CZESHINSKI, MICHAEL J

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: CRC 3.110 Hearing Date: 1/12/21 Hearing Time: 8:30 Hearing Department/Division: 11

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees - Comment: Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 09/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: CRC 3.110 Hearing Date: 1/12/21 Hearing Time: 8:30 Hearing Department/Division: 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less