This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/05/2020 at 22:46:40 (UTC).

CASTILLO, JR. VS GODINEZ

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 CASTILLO, JR filed an Other lawsuit against GODINEZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Schuett, Stephen D.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3414

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Schuett, Stephen D.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MADRIGAL, MARIA G

CASTILLO, ENRIQUE, Jr.

CASTILLO, VANESSA

Defendants

AND ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN CLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR EQUITABLE RIGHT, TITLE, ESTATE, LIEN, OR INTEREST IN THE PROPERTY DESCRIBED IN THE COMPLAINT, ADVERSE TO PLAINTIFFS TITLE OR ANY CLOUD ON PLAINTIFFS' TITLE THERETO

GODINEZ, DAVID

CASTILLO, ANABEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCCORMACK, SANDRA KUHN

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Cover Sheet for Notice of Pending Action. Please resubmit with Default.

Ruling

Ruling Moving OSC Hearing: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 3/20/2020 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:10

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Comment: Hearing continued per standing order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Cover Sheet for Notice of Pending Action. Please resubmit with Default.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketRequest For Entry of Default Not Entered - Comment: As to Anabel Castillo. Complaint filed 12/6/19. Number 5 a, b, c not completed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: As to David Godinez. Substituted Service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: As to Anabel Castillo. Personal Service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling Moving OSC Hearing: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 02/20/2020; Served: 01/29/2020; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 3/20/2020 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less