Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/17/2018 at 18:58:35 (UTC).

CASTELLANOS VS HERNANDEZ

Case Summary

On 07/07/2015 CASTELLANOS filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against HERNANDEZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Delano / Mcfarland Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Tafoya, Robert S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0035

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delano / Mcfarland Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Tafoya, Robert S.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CASTELLANOS, LIBRADA MARIA

Respondent

HERNANDEZ, ELIAZAR I

 

Court Documents

Request for Order - Petitioner

**MO - Request for Order - Petitioner's Request for Modification of Child Visitation and Move Away: Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Petitioner: CASTELLANOS, LIBRADA MARIA

Request for Order - Petitioner

MO - Request for Order - Petitioner: Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Petitioner: CASTELLANOS, LIBRADA MARIA

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order Before Hearing; Party: Names: CASTELLANOS, LIBRADA MARIA; HERNANDEZ, ELIAZAR I

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2016
  • Mail Returned Undelivered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • Notice of Change Name/Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • Findings and Orders - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Comment: HEARING 01/22/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Order - Petitioner - **MO - Request for Order - Petitioner's Request for Modification of Child Visitation and Move Away: Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Petitioner: CASTELLANOS, LIBRADA MARIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Order - Petitioner - MO - Request for Order - Petitioner: Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Petitioner: CASTELLANOS, LIBRADA MARIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2016
  • Proof of Personal Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2016
  • No Mediation Agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2016
  • Mediation Appointment - Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2015
  • Request for Order with Court Order (FL-300) - Comment: Petitioners request modification on child visitation and move away order

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 09/29/2015
  • Request to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2015
  • Declaration Re Service of Final Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2015
  • Declaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2015
  • Proof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Family Law Documents - Requested By: CASTELLANOS, LIBRADA MARIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Affidavit - Paralegal / Typing Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less