This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 05/14/2020 at 07:18:55 (UTC).

CASSIS, II VS MARK ANTONY RANTISSI D.B.A. CALIFORNIA CITY DELI

Case Summary

On 02/14/2020 CASSIS, II filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MARK ANTONY RANTISSI D B A CALIFORNIA CITY DELI. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Green, Kenneth R., Jr. and Stainfield, Bryan K.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0019

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

Stainfield, Bryan K.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CASSIS, SORAYA, II

Defendant

MARK ANTONY RANTISSI D.B.A. CALIFORNIA CITY DELI

 

Court Documents

Ruling

Ruling: Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling: Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: for continuance.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: CASSIS, SORAYA, II; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.