This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 09/25/2023 at 08:44:12 (UTC).

SUNBELT RENTALS, INC., A NORTH CAROLINA CORPORATION VS SEMERJIAN ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/08/2023 SUNBELT RENTALS, INC , A NORTH CAROLINA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SEMERJIAN. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Smith, T. Mark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1422

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Smith, T. Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SUNBELT RENTALS, INC., A NORTH CAROLINA CORPORATION

Defendants

SEMERJIAN, ALEX

MILIAN, RAJ

A AND M CONSTRUCTION, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KIM, EUGENE

ALFARO, MARIO HERBERT

 

Court Documents

Complaint

05/08/2023: Complaint

Summons Issued and Filed

05/09/2023: Summons Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

05/08/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

Order to Show Cause

05/09/2023: Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C)

05/09/2023: Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C)

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 08/25/2023

08/25/2023: Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 08/25/2023

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2023
  • HearingCase Number: BCV-23-101422; Style/Defendant: SUNBELT RENTALS, INC., A NORTH CAROLINA CORPORATION VS SEMERJIAN ET AL; Case Type: 06-CV Breach of Contract/Warranty-Civil Unlimited; Hearing Type: Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110; Judge: Smith, T. Mark; Courtroom: Bakersfield Traffic Courtroom T-2 located at 3131 Arrow St.; Case Category: Civil

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2023
  • HearingCase Number: BCV-23-101422; Style/Defendant: SUNBELT RENTALS, INC., A NORTH CAROLINA CORPORATION VS SEMERJIAN ET AL; Case Type: 06-CV Breach of Contract/Warranty-Civil Unlimited; Hearing Type: Case Management Conference; Judge: Smith, T. Mark; Courtroom: Bakersfield Traffic Courtroom T-2 located at 3131 Arrow St.; Case Category: Civil

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110; Judicial Officer: Smith, T. Mark; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: Cont'd from 08/25/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Smith, T. Mark; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2023
  • HearingCase Number: BCV-23-101422; Style/Defendant: SUNBELT RENTALS, INC., A NORTH CAROLINA CORPORATION VS SEMERJIAN ET AL; Case Type: 06-CV Breach of Contract/Warranty-Civil Unlimited; Hearing Type: Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110; Judge: Smith, T. Mark; Courtroom: Bakersfield Traffic Courtroom T-2 located at 3131 Arrow St.; Case Category: Civil

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110; Judicial Officer: Smith, T. Mark; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2023
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearance (RA-010); Comment: Throughout the Case-Plaintiffs

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2023
  • DocketDeclaration; Comment: of Mario H. Alfaro Re: Order to Show Cause for Failure to Comply with CRC Rule 3.110

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2023
  • DocketEx Parte Application for Extension of Time to Serve Pleading; Judicial Officer: Smith, T. Mark; Comment: and Order) GRANTED; Plaintiff to file proof of service not later than 8/25/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2023
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: as to Alex Semerjian, via Sub-service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2023
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: as to A AND M CONSTRUCTION, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, via Sub-service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents; Served: 05/24/20237:07 AM; Unserved; Served: 05/24/20237:07 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause; Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 08/22/2023 Hearing Time: 8:30 am Hearing Department/Division: T-2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less