This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 09/22/2023 at 01:33:20 (UTC).

DE LAGE LANDEN FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC., A CORPORATION VS MARTINEZ

Case Summary

On 04/10/2023 DE LAGE LANDEN FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC , A CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MARTINEZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Clark, Thomas S. and Cervantes, Gina M.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1089

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Clark, Thomas S.

Cervantes, Gina M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DE LAGE LANDEN FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC., A CORPORATION

Defendant

MARTINEZ, ALEXANDER SANCHEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TIBERI, SANDRA I

 

Court Documents

Complaint

04/10/2023: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

04/10/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

Summons Issued and Filed

04/11/2023: Summons Issued and Filed

Order to Show Cause

04/11/2023: Order to Show Cause

Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

05/25/2023: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

Request For Entry of Default Not Entered

06/13/2023: Request For Entry of Default Not Entered

Request for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered

06/20/2023: Request for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C)

04/11/2023: Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2023
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary and Non-Monetary Award; Awarded To; DE LAGE LANDEN FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC., A CORPORATION; Awarded Against; MARTINEZ, ALEXANDER SANCHEZ; Amount; Damages: $138,852.51; Pre-Judgment Interest: $6,595.67; Attorney Fees: $13,192.62; Costs: $531.20; Other: $3,673.87; Other Comment: Late charges /finance charge; Total: $162845.87; Status:: Judgment; Status Date:: 07/27/2023; Status Comment:: See Judgment for further detials regarding posession of equipment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2023
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court; Judicial Officer: Cervantes, Gina M.; Comment: Against Alexander Sancez Martinez dba Guzman Trucking

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110; Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2023
  • DocketDeclaration; Comment: Declaration in Support of Default Judgment 585d

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2023
  • DocketRequest for Court Judgment; Comment: As to Alexander Sanchez Martinez individually, and dba Guzman Trucking on complaint filed 4/10/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial); Comment: Without prejudice as to Does 1-100

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2023
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered; Comment: As to Alexander Sanchez Martinez, dba Guzman Trucking on complaint filed 4/10/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2023
  • DocketRequest For Entry of Default Not Entered; Comment: 1c incomplete for Default Request

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: as to Alexander Sanchez Martinez, indiviually and dba Guzman Trucking, via Sub-service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents; Served: 04/28/20231:00 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause; Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 7/25/2023 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less