This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 06/17/2023 at 12:04:32 (UTC).

ZENITH INSURANCE COMPANY VS LOPEZ ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/30/2023 ZENITH INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against LOPEZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The case status is Other - Consolidated.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0990

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2023

  • Case Status:

    Other - Consolidated

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ZENITH INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

LOPEZ, JOSEPH DENNIS

STEVENS TRANSPORTATION, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ERNST DAVID D

Defendant Attorney

HUGHES BRADFORD G

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

04/04/2023: Order to Show Cause

Notice of Related Case(s)

04/10/2023: Notice of Related Case(s)

Answer to Complaint

05/26/2023: Answer to Complaint

Rejection/Correction Notice

05/31/2023: Rejection/Correction Notice

 

Docket Entries

05/31/2023
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Rejection/Correction Notice; Comment: DO NOT FILE INTO CHILD CASE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Answer to Complaint; Filed By: DEFENDANT - LOPEZ, JOSEPH DENNIS|DEFENDANT - STEVENS TRANSPORTATION, INC.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/10/2023
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Notice of Related Case(s); Comment: Notice of Related Case; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - ZENITH INSURANCE COMPANY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/10/2023

DocketFile Type: Notice; Comment: Notice of Action; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - ZENITH INSURANCE COMPANY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/04/2023
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Order to Show Cause; Comment: Re: 3.110Hearing Date: 7/18/2023 Hearing Time: 8:30 AMHearing Department/Division: T-2

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/04/2023

DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - ZENITH INSURANCE COMPANY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/30/2023

DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010); Filed By: PLAINTIFF - ZENITH INSURANCE COMPANY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/30/2023

DocketFile Type: Complaint; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - ZENITH INSURANCE COMPANY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less