This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 07/10/2023 at 15:59:36 (UTC).

CALIFORNIA TRUCKERS SAFETY ASSOCIATION VS YOUNG'S COMMERCIAL TRANSFER, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/24/2023 CALIFORNIA TRUCKERS SAFETY ASSOCIATION filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against YOUNG'S COMMERCIAL TRANSFER, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1267

  • Filing Date:

    04/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CALIFORNIA TRUCKERS SAFETY ASSOCIATION

Defendants

YOUNG'S COMMERCIAL TRANSFER, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

GODINEZ, ANGEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SOLEIMANPOUR ASHKAN MATTHEW

 

Court Documents

Complaint

04/24/2023: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

04/24/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

Summons Issued and Filed

04/26/2023: Summons Issued and Filed

Order to Show Cause

04/26/2023: Order to Show Cause

Electronic Rejection Notice

07/06/2023: Electronic Rejection Notice

Request for Dismissal (Entire)

07/06/2023: Request for Dismissal (Entire)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Request for Dismissal (Entire); Comment: - with Prejudice; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - CALIFORNIA TRUCKERS SAFETY ASSOCIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Electronic Rejection Notice; Comment: RE: Request for Dismissal REASON: AS TO ITEM 1B: Please also indicate if Complaint or Petition Thank you.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Order to Show Cause; Comment: Re: 3.110Hearing Date: 8/9/2023 Hearing Time: 8:30 AMHearing Department/Division: 17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - CALIFORNIA TRUCKERS SAFETY ASSOCIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010); Filed By: PLAINTIFF - CALIFORNIA TRUCKERS SAFETY ASSOCIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Complaint; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - CALIFORNIA TRUCKERS SAFETY ASSOCIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less