This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 09/22/2023 at 06:29:30 (UTC).

ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC VS MIRANDA

Case Summary

On 05/17/2023 ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MIRANDA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Cervantes, Gina M.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2985

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Cervantes, Gina M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC

Defendant

MIRANDA, SONYA M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GIN, MARY

 

Court Documents

Complaint

05/17/2023: Complaint

Summons Issued and Filed

05/17/2023: Summons Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

05/17/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

Statement of Classification and Location

05/17/2023: Statement of Classification and Location

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

05/17/2023: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

05/17/2023: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

Declaration

05/24/2023: Declaration

Declaration of Non-Service

06/21/2023: Declaration of Non-Service

Declaration of Non-Service

06/20/2023: Declaration of Non-Service

Declaration

06/26/2023: Declaration

Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21)

05/17/2023: Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F)

05/17/2023: Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2024
  • HearingCase Number: BCL-23-012985; Style/Defendant: ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC VS MIRANDA; Case Type: 09-CL <10K Rule 3.740 Collections; Hearing Type: Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f); Judge: Cervantes, Gina M.; Courtroom: Bakersfield Division L; Case Category: Civil

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2024
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f); Judicial Officer: Cervantes, Gina M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2023
  • HearingCase Number: BCL-23-012985; Style/Defendant: ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC VS MIRANDA; Case Type: 09-CL <10K Rule 3.740 Collections; Hearing Type: Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d); Judge: Cervantes, Gina M.; Courtroom: Bakersfield Division L; Case Category: Civil

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d); Judicial Officer: Cervantes, Gina M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2023
  • DocketDeclaration; Comment: of Non-Service as to Sonya M Miranda, 1 attempt

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2023
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service; Comment: as to Sonya M Miranda, 1 attempt

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2023
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service; Comment: as to Sonya M Miranda, 1 attempt

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketDeclaration; Comment: of Non-Service as to Sonya M Miranda, 1 attempt

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents; Unserved

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less