This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 12/02/2023 at 07:58:09 (UTC).

TARVER VS MERCY HOSPITAL OF BAKERSFIELD

Case Summary

On 05/03/2023 TARVER filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MERCY HOSPITAL OF BAKERSFIELD. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Smith, T. Mark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1374

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Smith, T. Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TARVER, ROBERT

Defendant

COMMONSPIRIT HEALTH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAVIS, STEVEN D

Defendant Attorney

TROTTER, MICHAEL J

 

Court Documents

Complaint

05/03/2023: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

05/03/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

Summons Issued and Filed

05/04/2023: Summons Issued and Filed

Order to Show Cause

05/05/2023: Order to Show Cause

Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

06/20/2023: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C)

05/05/2023: Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C)

Case Management Conference 10/31/2023

10/31/2023: Case Management Conference 10/31/2023

 

Docket Entries

02/10/2025

HearingCase Number: BCV-23-101374; Style/Defendant: TARVER VS MERCY HOSPITAL OF BAKERSFIELD; Case Type: 23-CV Other PI/PD/WD - Civil Unlimited; Hearing Type: Jury Trial; Judge: Smith, T. Mark; Courtroom: Bakersfield Traffic Courtroom T-2 located at 3131 Arrow St.; Case Category: Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/10/2025

DocketJury Trial; Judicial Officer: Smith, T. Mark; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: TE: 7 days // Plaintiff's jury

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/30/2025

HearingCase Number: BCV-23-101374; Style/Defendant: TARVER VS MERCY HOSPITAL OF BAKERSFIELD; Case Type: 23-CV Other PI/PD/WD - Civil Unlimited; Hearing Type: Final Case Management Conference; Judge: Smith, T. Mark; Courtroom: Bakersfield Traffic Courtroom T-2 located at 3131 Arrow St.; Case Category: Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/30/2025

DocketFinal Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Smith, T. Mark; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Comment: JT: 02/10/25 // TE: 7 days // Plaintiff's jury

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/29/2023

HearingCase Number: BCV-23-101374; Style/Defendant: TARVER VS MERCY HOSPITAL OF BAKERSFIELD; Case Type: 23-CV Other PI/PD/WD - Civil Unlimited; Hearing Type: Further Case Management Conference; Judge: Smith, T. Mark; Courtroom: Bakersfield Traffic Courtroom T-2 located at 3131 Arrow St.; Case Category: Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/29/2023

DocketFurther Case Management Conference; Original Type: Further Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Smith, T. Mark; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Draft Incomplete; Comment: Cont'd from 10/31/23

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/06/2023

DocketNotice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/06/2023

DocketCase Management Statement; Comment: 11/29/2023 8:30 a.m. Traffic Courtroom 2

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2023

DocketNotice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2023

HearingCase Number: BCV-23-101374; Style/Defendant: TARVER VS MERCY HOSPITAL OF BAKERSFIELD; Case Type: 23-CV Other PI/PD/WD - Civil Unlimited; Hearing Type: Case Management Conference; Judge: Smith, T. Mark; Courtroom: Bakersfield Traffic Courtroom T-2 located at 3131 Arrow St.; Case Category: Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
10/16/2023

DocketCase Management Statement; Comment: 10/31/2023 8:30 a.m. Traffic Courtroom 2

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/17/2023
View Court Documents

DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110; Judicial Officer: Smith, T. Mark; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2023

DocketNotice; Comment: Notice of Change of Firm Name as to Kelly, Trotter & Franzen, a Law Corporation

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2023

DocketAnswer to Complaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/20/2023

DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: as to MERCY HOSPITAL OF BAKERSFIELD, via Personal service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/05/2023

DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents; Served: 06/12/20232:28 PM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketOrder to Show Cause; Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 08/17/2023 Hearing Time: 8:30 a.m. Hearing Department/Division: T-2

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/04/2023

DocketSummons Issued and Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/03/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/03/2023

DocketComplaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less