This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 21:08:01 (UTC).

CARTER VS CARTER

Case Summary

On 09/29/2017 CARTER filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against CARTER. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Shafter / Wasco Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Camacho, Marcos R. and Shayer, Steven. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0204

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Shafter / Wasco Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Camacho, Marcos R.

Shayer, Steven

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CARTER, LAUREN

Respondent

CARTER, WESLEY

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: DEFAULT

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: DEFAULT

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Shayer, Steven; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order Before Hearing; Party: Names: CARTER, LAUREN; CARTER, WESLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution (Default) - Judicial Officer: Shayer, Steven; Comment: DISSOLUTION DATE 07/18/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • DocketDeclaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution (FL-170)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Preliminary/Final Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketFamily Law Documents - Requested By: CARTER, LAUREN; Served: 11/24/20176:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.