This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 12/07/2023 at 07:31:50 (UTC).

CARRILLO VS FOODS CO. ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/21/2022 CARRILLO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against FOODS CO. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Bradshaw, J. Eric, Zulfa, David and Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0959

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Bradshaw, J. Eric

Zulfa, David

Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CARRILLO, JOSEFINA

Defendant

FOOD 4 LESS OF CALIFORINIA, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TROSHCHIY, OLGA

Defendant Attorney

STONE, GREGORY E

 

Court Documents

Complaint

04/21/2022: Complaint

Summons Issued and Filed

04/22/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

04/21/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

Order to Show Cause

04/22/2022: Order to Show Cause

Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

06/14/2022: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

Answer to Complaint

06/30/2022: Answer to Complaint

Case Management Statement

09/30/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

09/30/2022: Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

09/30/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Conference

10/19/2022: Case Management Conference

Minute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf

01/30/2023: Minute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf

Mail Returned Undelivered

02/03/2023: Mail Returned Undelivered

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C)

04/22/2022: Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C)

Case Management Conference 10/19/2022

10/19/2022: Case Management Conference 10/19/2022

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

08/19/2024

HearingCase Number: BCV-22-100959; Style/Defendant: CARRILLO VS FOODS CO. ET AL; Case Type: 23-CV Other PI/PD/WD - Civil Unlimited; Hearing Type: Jury Trial; Judge: Zulfa, David; Courtroom: Bakersfield Division J; Case Category: Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/19/2024

DocketJury Trial; Judicial Officer: Zulfa, David; Hearing Time: 09:30 AM; Comment: Def jury T/E 7 days

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2024

HearingCase Number: BCV-22-100959; Style/Defendant: CARRILLO VS FOODS CO. ET AL; Case Type: 23-CV Other PI/PD/WD - Civil Unlimited; Hearing Type: Final Case Management Conference; Judge: Zulfa, David; Courtroom: Bakersfield Division J; Case Category: Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2024

DocketFinal Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Zulfa, David; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Comment: Jury trial set 10/23/23 T/E 7 days

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2024

HearingCase Number: BCV-22-100959; Style/Defendant: CARRILLO VS FOODS CO. ET AL; Case Type: 23-CV Other PI/PD/WD - Civil Unlimited; Hearing Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.; Courtroom: Bakersfield Division H; Case Category: Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2024

DocketMandatory Settlement Conference; Judicial Officer: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Comment: FCMC: 10/20/2023 // J/T: 10/23/2023; T/E: 7 DAYS (D-J)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023

DocketMail Returned Undelivered; Comment: Notice of Trial addressed to Gregory E Stone; copy mailed to forwarding address

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2023

DocketMinute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2023

DocketStipulation and Order; Judicial Officer: Zulfa, David; Comment: in Support of Requested Continuance This Court, having considered the foregoing stipulation of the parties, and all papers submitted in connection therewith, finds that good cause exists for a continuance of trial in this case. Trial currently set for October 23, 2023 at 9:30 a.m. is hereby continued to August 19, 2024 at 9:30 a.m. All discovery, motion, and pre-trial cut-off dates are to follow the new trial date; and The Final Status Conference currently set for October 20, 2023 at 1:30 p.m. is hereby continued to August 16, 2024 at 1:30 p.m. Div. J; and The Mandatory Settlement Conference currently set for September 29, 2023 at 9:00 a.m. is hereby continued to July 19, 2024 To Be Determined. IT IS SO ORDERED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/03/2023

DocketMail Returned Undelivered; Comment: Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference. Re-sent to address provided on "Return to sender' sticker: 21052 Oxnard St Woodland Hills Ca 91367

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
09/30/2022

DocketNotice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/30/2022

DocketCase Management Statement; Comment: Case Management Statement

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/05/2022
View Court Documents

DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110; Judicial Officer: Bradshaw, J. Eric; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/30/2022

DocketAnswer to Complaint; Comment: Food 4 Less of California, Inc. dba Foods Co. Answer to Complaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2022

DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: as to Foods Co., via sub service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/22/2022

DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents; Served: 06/13/202212:55 PM; Unserved; Unserved

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/22/2022
View Court Documents

DocketOrder to Show Cause; Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 08/05/2022 Hearing Time: 8:30 am Hearing Department/Division: J

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/22/2022

DocketSummons Issued and Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/21/2022

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/21/2022

DocketComplaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less