This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/20/2018 at 15:16:30 (UTC).

CARRANZA VS CARRANZA

Case Summary

On 02/19/2016 CARRANZA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against CARRANZA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Green, Kenneth R., Jr., Glennon, Donald P., Jr. and Zulfa, David. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0070

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

Zulfa, David

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CARRANZA, MARIA LOPEZ

Respondent

CARRANZA, JESSIE

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 09/18/2017: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Dismissed

Request for Order - Respondent

Request for Order - Respondent 08/21/2017: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Petitioner: CARRANZA, MARIA LOPEZ; Respondent: CARRANZA, JESSIE

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Request for Order - Respondent

Request for Order - Respondent 07/10/2017: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Petitioner: CARRANZA, MARIA LOPEZ; Respondent: CARRANZA, JESSIE

Request for Order - Respondent

Request for Order - Respondent 05/22/2017: Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Dropped; Parties Present Petitioner: CARRANZA, MARIA LOPEZ; Respondent: CARRANZA, JESSIE

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2017
  • Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • Mediation Appointment - Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Order - Petitioner - Request for Order - Petitioner 09/18/2017: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • Proof of Service by Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • Proof of Service by Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • Findings and Orders - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • Stipulation and Order - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Order - Respondent - Request for Order - Respondent 08/21/2017: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Petitioner: CARRANZA, MARIA LOPEZ; Respondent: CARRANZA, JESSIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • Temporary Emergency Court Orders Issued (FL-305)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 05/22/2017
  • Mediation Appointment - Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Order - Respondent - Request for Order - Respondent 05/22/2017: Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Dropped; Parties Present Petitioner: CARRANZA, MARIA LOPEZ; Respondent: CARRANZA, JESSIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • Temporary Emergency Court Orders Issued (FL-305) - Judicial Officer: Zulfa, David; Comment: DENIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • Request for Order (FL-300)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • Declaration Regarding Notice and Service of Request for - Comment: Temporary Emergency (Ex Parte) Orders

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • Proof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less