This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 10:48:42 (UTC).

CARPENTER VS TEHACHAPI-CUMMINGS WATER DISTRICT ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/09/2015 CARPENTER filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against TEHACHAPI-CUMMINGS WATER DISTRICT. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Chapin, Sidney P., Brumfield, Lorna H., Clark, Thomas S., Etienne, Linda S. and Lampe, David R.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1170

  • Filing Date:

    10/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Chapin, Sidney P.

Brumfield, Lorna H.

Clark, Thomas S.

Etienne, Linda S.

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CARPENTER, DENNIS

Defendants

DOES SUPERVISOR THREE

DOES SUPERVISOR ONE

DOES SUPERVISOR TWO

TEHACHAPI-CUMMINGS WATER DISTRICT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KUMPEL, FREDERICK

Defendant Attorneys

GILL, HARVEEN K

URBANIC, JOSEPH T.

 

Court Documents

Trial Setting Conference

Trial Setting Conference 02/01/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: to set new trial date; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: KUMPEL, FREDERICK; Defendant; Attorney: URBANIC, JOSEPH T.

Final Case Management Conference

RULING Jury Trial 01/29/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Ruling; Comment: ESTIMATE 5 DAYS

Mandatory Settlement Conference - Further

Mandatory Settlement Conference - Further 12/08/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: #2 SET PURSUANT TO MO DATED 4/20/17; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: KUMPEL, FREDERICK

Mandatory Settlement Conference

Mandatory Settlement Conference 09/29/2017: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: #1; Parties Present Plaintiff: CARPENTER, DENNIS; Attorney: KUMPEL, FREDERICK

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses 04/20/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 3/22/17 Defendant, TEHACHAPI-CUMMINGS COUNTY WATER DISTRICT Motion to Compel Further Responses from Plaintiff to Discovery Requests ResID: 24311; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: KUMPEL, FREDERICK

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses 02/15/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Filed 1/13/17, by Defendant. Motion to Compel Further Responses from Plaintiff to Discovery Requests; Request for Sanctions ResID: 23735.; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: KUMPEL, FREDERICK

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 09/30/2016: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 2nd continuance; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: KUMPEL, FREDERICK

Ruling

Ruling: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling; Comment: Re: Certificate of Progress

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

**MO w/Declaration of Mailing 3.110: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 3rd continuance

Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition)

Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition) 08/13/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: pursuant to CRC Rule 3.1380(b); Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: KUMPEL, FREDERICK; Defendant; Attorney: URBANIC, JOSEPH T.

Mandatory Settlement Conference

Mandatory Settlement Conference 07/27/2018: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: T/E 5 days CFM/TD 8-27-18; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: KUMPEL, FREDERICK

Ruling

Minute Order Dated 7-6-18: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Ruling

Ruling 01/17/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Motion to Compel

Motion to Compel 06/09/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: continued by the court; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: KUMPEL, FREDERICK; Defendant; Attorney: URBANIC, JOSEPH T.

Motion to Compel

Motion to Compel 06/06/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: court continues; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: KUMPEL, FREDERICK; Defendant; Attorney: URBANIC, JOSEPH T.

Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition

Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition 04/18/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: EX PARTE; DEFENDANT TEHACHAPI-CUMMINGS COUNTY WATER DISTRICT FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO FILE, SERVE AND HEAR A MOTION TO CONTINUE MSC AND TRIAL DATES. DATE 4/18/17 TIME 8:30 AM DEPT. 17; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: KUMPEL, FREDERICK

Case Management Conference

**MO - Public OSC X2 AND CMC: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: KUMPEL, FREDERICK

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

**MO w/Declaration of Mailing OSC 3.110: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2018
  • DocketMiscellaneous Filing - Comment: Payroll case cost summary

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Full Satisfaction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment - Comment: Notice of Entry of Cost Judgment by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • DocketJudgment - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Comment: Cost Judgment by court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • DocketMiscellaneous Filing - Comment: court fees billing form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs - Comment: Memorandum of Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • DocketReporter's Transcript - Comment: Re Proceedings of 8-27-18 Reporter: Susan e Gonzalez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • DocketMiscellaneous Filing - Comment: Payroll Case Cost Summary

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Judgment Type: Jury Verdict (CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
146 More Docket Entries
  • 03/16/2016
  • DocketAmended Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: [1st Amended] Returned via Kumpel pickup

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2016
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - **MO w/Declaration of Mailing OSC 3.110: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • DocketRuling/Certificate of Progress - Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Comment: Re; Certificate of progress filed 1-15. Ruling; OSC set for 3-15-16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • DocketCertificate of Progress

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Unserved; Unserved; Unserved; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ATTY BIN "FRED KUMPEL"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 1/22/16 Hearing Time: 830AM Hearing Department/Division: 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • DocketComplaint - Comment: FILED BY FREDERICK C. KUMPEL CMC 4/6/16 @ 815AM D17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.