This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 07:17:48 (UTC).

CAROLINA HERRERA CONSERVATEE

Case Summary

On 08/11/2015 CAROLINA HERRERA CONSERVATEE was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Knight, Alisa R., Wyatt, Ralph W. and Kendall, Andrew. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2328

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Knight, Alisa R.

Wyatt, Ralph W.

Kendall, Andrew

 

Party Details

Petitioners

HERRERA, OLIVIA

HERRERA, JESUS

HERRERA, LETICIA

 

Court Documents

Petition

Petition 02/09/2018: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - to remove travel restrictions from order filed 11/23/15; Parties Present Petitioner: HERRERA, LETICIA

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: as to Michael J. Alston

Petition

Petition 12/05/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING to remove travel restrictions from Order filed on 11/23/2015 SAME NOTE - 1. Need proof of mailing.; Parties Present Petitioner: HERRERA, LETICIA

Petition

Petition 09/26/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - to Remove Travel Restrictions from Order Filed on 11/23/2015 NOTE - 1. Need proof of mailing.; Parties Present Petitioner: HERRERA, JESUS; Petitioner: HERRERA, LETICIA; Petitioner: HERRERA, OLIVIA

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Application and order

Order to Appear

MO Order to appear: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING; Parties Present Petitioner: HERRERA, JESUS; Petitioner: HERRERA, LETICIA; Petitioner: HERRERA, OLIVIA

Compliance Hearing

03/01/16 MO - COMPLIANCE HEARING Probate w/Declaration of Mailing: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING NOTE: 1. As of 1/29/16, the Level of Care form & Notice of Conservatee's Rights have not been submitted for filing.

Petition for Appointment of Conservator

PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF CONSERVATOR: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING NOTES- 1. Need Family Court Service Report. 2. Need Kern Regional Report.; Parties Present Petitioner: HERRERA, JESUS; Petitioner: HERRERA, LETICIA; Petitioner: HERRERA, OLIVIA

Ruling

Ruling 8/18/15 ls: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2018
  • DocketStatus Review Investigation Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition - Petition 02/09/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - to remove travel restrictions from order filed 11/23/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: as to Michael J. Alston

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: 02/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition - Petition 12/05/2017: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING to remove travel restrictions from Order filed on 11/23/2015 SAME NOTE - 1. Need proof of mailing.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition - Petition 09/26/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - to Remove Travel Restrictions from Order Filed on 11/23/2015 NOTE - 1. Need proof of mailing.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Application and order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • DocketPetition (Subsequent) - Comment: to Remove Travel Restrictions from Order Filed on 11/23/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2016
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: 2ND REQUEST , ORDER & LETTER'S PREVIOUSLY ISSUED 11/23/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2016
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 08/11/2015
  • DocketConfidential Information - Comment: identification information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • DocketConfidential Information - Comment: identification information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • DocketConfidential Information - Comment: identification information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • DocketReferral for Investigative Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • DocketConfidential Screening Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • DocketConfidential Screening Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • DocketConfidential Screening Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • DocketConfidential Supplemental Information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • DocketDuties of Conservator

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Conservator - Comment: Petition for Appointment of Probate Conservator of the Person Limited Conservatorship

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.