Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 02:56:30 (UTC).

CARLOS BENAVIDEZ DECEASED

Case Summary

On 05/10/2017 CARLOS BENAVIDEZ DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Knight, Alisa R., Kohler, Greg J. and Kendall, Andrew. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2447

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Knight, Alisa R.

Kohler, Greg J.

Kendall, Andrew

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Not Classified By Court

BENAVIDES, ALMA

BENAVIDEZ, ALMA

BENAVIDEZ, CARLOS, Jr.

BENAVIDEZ, CARLOS ADAM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

OLDFIELD, GERALD H

 

Court Documents

Compliance Hearing

Compliance Hearing 01/16/2020: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NOTE - 1. As of 12/27/19, petition to close estate has not been filed.

Hearing on Status Report PC 12200

Hearing on Status Report PC 12200 08/15/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: BOND & LETTERS ATTORNEY BIN

Court Trial

Court Trial 02/16/2018: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING -; Parties Present Petitioner: BENAVIDEZ, ALMA; Attorney: OLDFIELD, GERALD H; Objector: BENAVIDEZ, CARLOS, Jr.; Objector: BENAVIDEZ, CARLOS ADAM

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 01/22/2018: Judicial Officer: Kohler, Greg J.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING -PETITION FOR LETTERS; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: OLDFIELD, GERALD H; Objector: BENAVIDEZ, CARLOS, Jr.; Objector: BENAVIDEZ, CARLOS ADAM

Petition for Letters

Petition for Letters 12/07/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - (Carlos Benavidez Jr Petition) NOTES - 1. Need proof of mailing. 2. Need proof of publication. 3. Need date of birth for minor/Sonya Benavidez.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: OLDFIELD, GERALD H

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Duties and Liabilities...returned via in pro per out basket

Petition for Letters

10/19/2017 MO: Petition for Letters: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING; Parties Present Petitioner: BENAVIDEZ, ALMA; Attorney: OLDFIELD, GERALD H; Objector: BENAVIDEZ, CARLOS, Jr.; Objector: BENAVIDEZ, CARLOS ADAM

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Objection returned via outbasket

Petition for Letters

Petition for Letters 06/23/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING; Parties Present Petitioner: BENAVIDEZ, ALMA; Attorney: OLDFIELD, GERALD H

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketCompliance Hearing - Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: RE: FILING OF PETITION TO CLOSE ESTATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCompliance Hearing - Compliance Hearing 01/16/2020: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NOTE - 1. As of 12/27/19, petition to close estate has not been filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing on Status Report PC 12200 - Hearing on Status Report PC 12200 08/15/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • DocketCompliance Hearing - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Cancel Reason: In Compliance; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NOTE - 1. As of 02/07/19, 12200 status report or petition to close estate has not been submitted for filing.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • DocketStatus Report - Comment: Report of status of administration Probate Code Sec. 12200

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • DocketLetters of Administration - Comment: Letters of Administration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • DocketBond Undertaking

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • DocketOrder For Probate - Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: BOND & LETTERS ATTORNEY BIN

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 07/24/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Objection returned via outbasket

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Letters - Petition for Letters 06/23/2017: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • DocketProof of Publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • DocketNotice of Petition to Administer Estate - Comment: 06/23/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • DocketConfidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities of - Comment: Personal Representative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities of Personal Representative - Comment: Duties and Liabilities

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • DocketPetition for Letters of Administration - Comment: Petition for Letters of Administration Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act with Full Authority

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer OLDFIELD, GERALD H