This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 10/18/2021 at 09:39:42 (UTC).

CARL BURNETT DECEASED

Case Summary

On 07/27/2021 CARL BURNETT DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Kendall, Andrew and Myers, Brett. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2738

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Kendall, Andrew

Myers, Brett

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HOPKINS, MICHAEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

DAKE, STEPHEN M

 

Court Documents

Petition for Probate of Will

Petition for Probate of Will 09/16/2021: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING -

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketCompliance Hearing - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: compliance hearing re: either a report of status of administrator pursuant to PC 12200 et seq. or petition to close estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketLetters Testamentary

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketOrder For Probate - Judicial Officer: Myers, Brett

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketConfidential Statement - Comment: Confidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities of Personal Representative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketAudio streaming announced.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Probate of Will - Petition for Probate of Will 09/16/2021: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketProof of Publication - Comment: The Daily Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Petition to Administer Estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketPetition for Probate of Will and Letters Testamentary

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAKE, STEPHEN M