Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 07/04/2021 at 10:06:00 (UTC).

CARINO VS ADVENTIST HEALTH DELANO

Case Summary

On 12/08/2020 CARINO filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against ADVENTIST HEALTH DELANO. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Clark, Thomas S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2879

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Clark, Thomas S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JUSTIN CARINO, INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF OTHER PERSONS SIMILARLY SITUATED

CARINO, JUSTIN

CARINO

Defendants

ADVENTIST HEALTH DELANO

ADVENTIST HEALTH SYSTEMS/WEST

ADVENTIST HEALTH SYSTEMS WEST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BOLLINGER, JEREMY F

Defendant Attorney

SMITH, T MARK

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 06/07/2021: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Comment: continued from 06/07/2021 - pending mediation

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: as to Proof of Service; Second Rejection. Party does not conform to the Complaint. Party must match word for word. Please review the Complaint.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Thomas Smith Re: Stipulation and (Proposed) Order. Reason: We need $1435.00 for defendants, $435+complex fee of $1000.00. Please resubmit with $435.00 and then select the Complex fee of $1000.00 not two $435.00 fees. Thank you.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Jeremy Bollinger Re: Stipulation and Order Reason: We need first appearance fees from Defendant ($1435.00) in Order to process the Stipulation and Order. Please resubmit together with fees.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: as to Proof of Service x2; Party does not conform to the First Amended Complaint. Party served is not a party to the Action. Please review.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: as to Notice and Acknowledgement of Receipt X2; Notice is not a valid form of Service on its own, this is an attachment. Please resubmit Notice attached behind completed POS-010 and file as one document. As to second Notice, party served is not a party to the action. Please seek legal advice.

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 03/23/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:17

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Case Management Conference 06/07/2021: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Comment: continued from 06/07/2021 - pending mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Case Management Conference 06/07/2021: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees - Comment: Notice of Posting Jury Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees - Comment: Notice of Posting Jury Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketAnswer to Second Amended Complaint - Comment: DEFENDANTS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Adventist Health Delano DBA Delano Regional Medical Center, A California Corporation via Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: as to Proof of Service; Second Rejection. Party does not conform to the Complaint. Party must match word for word. Please review the Complaint.

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Thomas Smith Re: Stipulation and (Proposed) Order. Reason: We need $1435.00 for defendants, $435+complex fee of $1000.00. Please resubmit with $435.00 and then select the Complex fee of $1000.00 not two $435.00 fees. Thank you.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Jeremy Bollinger Re: Stipulation and Order Reason: We need first appearance fees from Defendant ($1435.00) in Order to process the Stipulation and Order. Please resubmit together with fees.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: as to Proof of Service x2; Party does not conform to the First Amended Complaint. Party served is not a party to the Action. Please review.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: as to Notice and Acknowledgement of Receipt X2; Notice is not a valid form of Service on its own, this is an attachment. Please resubmit Notice attached behind completed POS-010 and file as one document. As to second Notice, party served is not a party to the action. Please seek legal advice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint - Comment: First Amended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 01/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 03/23/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ADVENTIST HEALTH SYSTEM/WEST is a litigant

Latest cases where ADVENTIST HEALTH WHITE MEMORIAL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SMITH, T MARK