This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 02:28:18 (UTC).

CARDENAS VS PARAMOUNT FARMS, INC. ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/16/2016 CARDENAS filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against PARAMOUNT FARMS, INC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Chapin, Sidney P., Clark, Thomas S., Etienne, Linda S. and Schuett, Stephen D.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1374

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Chapin, Sidney P.

Clark, Thomas S.

Etienne, Linda S.

Schuett, Stephen D.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CARDENAS, JESSENIA

Defendants

WONDERFUL PISTACHIOS & ALMONDS, LLC

PARAMOUNT FARMS, INTL. LLC

PARAMOUNT FARMS, INC.

DOWDLE, WALTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GEORGE, MEGHAN ELISABETH

Rosen, James R

Defendant Attorneys

TRABOULSI, JOHNNY

GALLO, JOIE MARIE

 

Court Documents

Motion (Pre-Disposition)

Motion (Pre-Disposition) 11/30/2017: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 10/25/2017 PLAINTIFF TO REOPEN DISCOVERY, INCLUDING EXPERT DISCOVERY TRANSFERRED TO DEPARTMENT 17 FOR HEARING ONLY, DEPARTMENT 4 IS DARK.; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: Rosen, James R; Defendant; Attorney: TRABOULSI, JOHNNY; Attorney: GALLO, JOIE MARIE; Defendant; Attorney: TRABOULSI, JOHNNY

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 11/30/2017: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: (Set per MO 09/27/17); Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: Rosen, James R; Defendant; Attorney: TRABOULSI, JOHNNY; Defendant; Attorney: TRABOULSI, JOHNNY

Ruling

Ruling: Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Result: Department Transfer

Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition

Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition 09/27/2017: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 9/26/2017 PLAINTIFF APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING THE TRIAL DATE AND RELATED TRIAL DEADLINES; Parties Present Plaintiff: CARDENAS, JESSENIA; Defendant; Attorney: TRABOULSI, JOHNNY; Defendant; Attorney: TRABOULSI, JOHNNY

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Jessenia Cardenas Document: Ex parte Application Duplicate filing received. Messenger service filed a hard copy before noon.

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses 09/18/2017: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 8/24/17 Defendants, WONDERFUL PISTACHIOS & ALMONDS LLC and WALTER DOWDLE Motion to Compel Further Responses to Defendant's Discovery Requests and Requests for Sanctions ResID: 25591 ************************************************ TENTATIVE: MOTION TO COMPEL IS MOOT. AWARD MOVING PARTY SANCTIONS IN THE TOTAL AMOUNT OF $2250.00. *****************************************************; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: TRABOULSI, JOHNNY; Defendant; Attorney: TRABOULSI, JOHNNY

Mandatory Settlement Conference

Mandatory Settlement Conference 09/08/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: T/E 4 days CFM 9-29-17 / TD 10-10-17; Parties Present Defendant: DOWDLE, WALTER

Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition

Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition 09/05/2017: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 9/01/2017 PLAINTIFF APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO HEAR THE LAW OFFICE OF TODD M. FRIEDMAN'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: TRABOULSI, JOHNNY; Defendant; Attorney: TRABOULSI, JOHNNY

Case Management Conference

12/14/16 MO: Case Management Conference: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: TRABOULSI, JOHNNY; Defendant; Attorney: TRABOULSI, JOHNNY

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: RE: NOTICE - DUPLICATE FILING UPLOADED

Final Case Management Conference

Final Case Management Conference 10/01/2018: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Result: Held; Comment: cont: 08/17/18 TRJ 10/15/18

Ruling

Ruling 09/20/2018: Hearing Time: 04:00 PM; Result: Ruling

Final Case Management Conference

Final Case Management Conference 08/17/2018: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 02:00 PM; Result: Held; Comment: TRJ 08/27/17 JURY

Motion for Medical Examination

Motion for Medical Examination 08/08/2018: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Filed 7/30/18, by Defendants. Motion to Compel Psychiatric Independent Medical Examination of Plaintiff Jessenia Cardenas. ResID: 32596

Ruling

Ruling 08/08/2018: Hearing Time: 03:30 PM; Result: Ruling

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: RE: Exhibits - do not conform to CRC 2.111 First Page Format

Motion to Allow Discovery

Motion to Allow Discovery 03/05/2018: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 2/1/16 Plaintiff, JESSENIA CARDENAS Motion to Designate Expert Witnesses ResID: 29024

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Re-Notice - $20 fee required.

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: CRC 31385 Why this matter should not be dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: With Prejudice - As to Entire Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • DocketJury Trial - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: T/E 10 BOTH JURY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: RE: NOTICE - DUPLICATE FILING UPLOADED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinal Case Management Conference - Final Case Management Conference 10/01/2018: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Result: Held; Comment: cont: 08/17/18 TRJ 10/15/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • DocketNotice - Comment: NOTICE TO THE COURT AND PLAINTIFF'S AND DEFENDANTS' STIPULATION RE: MOTIONS IN LIMINE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • DocketObjections - Comment: JESSENIA CARDENAS' OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANTS' NOTICE IN LIEU OF SERVICE OF SUBPOENA FOR ATTENDANCE AT TRIAL AND DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • DocketExhibits in Support - Comment: Defendants' Second Amended [Proposed Exhibit List]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling 09/26/2018: Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
162 More Docket Entries
  • 09/21/2016
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO WALTER DOWDLE,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2016
  • DocketRuling - Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2016
  • DocketNotice of Insufficient Filing Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2016
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: FILED BY JOHNNY TRABOULSI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: Returned via ACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date:09/30/16 Hearing Time: 08:30 Hearing Department/Division:4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 07/26/2016; Served: 07/26/2016; Served: 06/29/2016; Served: 07/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PARAMOUNT FARMS INTERNATIONAL LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where WONDERFUL PISTACHIOS & ALMONDS, LLC is a litigant