This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 09:20:45 (UTC).

CARDENAS VS CARDENAS

Case Summary

On 09/14/2016 CARDENAS filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against CARDENAS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Stainfield, Bryan K. and Green, Kenneth R., Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0300

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Stainfield, Bryan K.

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CARDENAS, CLAUDIA I.

Respondent

CARDENAS, CHRISTIAN A.

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause in re Contempt (Petitioner)

Order to Show Cause in re Contempt (Petitioner) 08/21/2017: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Dropped; Parties Present Petitioner: CARDENAS, CLAUDIA I.

Further Hearing

Further Hearing 07/24/2017: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Petitioner: CARDENAS, CLAUDIA I.; Respondent: CARDENAS, CHRISTIAN A.

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Request for Order - Petitioner

12/05/16 MO: Request For Order- Petitioner: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Petitioner: CARDENAS, CLAUDIA I.; Respondent: CARDENAS, CHRISTIAN A.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re Contempt (Petitioner) - Order to Show Cause in re Contempt (Petitioner) 08/21/2017: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Dropped

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFurther Hearing - Further Hearing 07/24/2017: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re Contempt - Comment: Hearing Date: 8/21/17 Hearing Time: 9:00 A.M. Hearing Department/Division:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order After Hearing; Party: Names: CARDENAS, CLAUDIA I.; CARDENAS, CHRISTIAN A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • DocketMediation Agreement and Order - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • DocketRestraining Order After Hearing - CLETS - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • DocketMediation Appointment - Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • DocketProof of Personal Service

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 12/05/2016
  • DocketMediation Appointment - Original Type: Mediation Appointment; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - 12/05/16 MO: Request For Order- Petitioner: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • DocketProof of Personal Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • DocketRequest for Order (FL-300)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Comment: PER COURT CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2016
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.