This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/22/2018 at 06:52:22 (UTC).

CARDENAS VS ALCAZAR

Case Summary

On 10/21/2016 CARDENAS filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ALCAZAR. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Loo, Cynthia L.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4622

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Loo, Cynthia L.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CARDENAS, RAMON RUELAS

Respondent

ALCAZAR, AMELIA RENDON

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: DEFAULT

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • Judgment of Dissolution (Default) - Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Comment: STATUS END DATE: 10/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • Request to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • Declaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution (FL-170)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • Declaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • Affidavit - Paralegal / Typing Service - Comment: MAYTE'S TYPING SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less