This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 05/23/2023 at 08:43:26 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE, N.A. VS GROOMS

Case Summary

On 02/24/2023 CAPITAL ONE, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GROOMS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern River Branch located in Kern, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0012

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE, N.A.

Defendant

GROOMS, AMANDA P

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

APOSHIAN GEORGE V

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

02/24/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

Declaration

02/24/2023: Declaration

Statement of Classification and Location

02/24/2023: Statement of Classification and Location

Summons Issued and Filed

02/24/2023: Summons Issued and Filed

Complaint

02/24/2023: Complaint

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

02/24/2023: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

04/25/2023: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2024
  • HearingHearing Type: Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f); Dept.: Ridgecrest Division A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d); Dept.: Ridgecrest Division A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - CAPITAL ONE, N.A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Complaint; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - CAPITAL ONE, N.A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - CAPITAL ONE, N.A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Statement of Classification and Location; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - CAPITAL ONE, N.A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Declaration; Comment: Re: Non-Military Status; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - CAPITAL ONE, N.A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010); Filed By: PLAINTIFF - CAPITAL ONE, N.A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less