Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/25/2020 at 21:27:00 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK VS WREN

Case Summary

On 04/13/2012 CAPITAL ONE BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against WREN. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Arvin / Lamont Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Witt, Gary R.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6840

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arvin / Lamont Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Witt, Gary R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

Defendant

WREN, CARL R

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KENNARD, ROBERT SCOTT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2013
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Not Entered - Comment: DISMISSAL NOT ENTERED AS REQUESTED: CASE WAS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE ON 4/18/13.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2013
  • DocketNP1511 - Comment: Department: AL Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: DAVID GALE MAKES A SPECIAL APPEARANCE FOR ROBERT SCOTT KENNARD ON BEHALF OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. (PL-1). NO APPEARANCE BY DEFENDANT, CARL R. WREN MOTION FOR DISMISSAL IS GRANTED. CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. ELECTRONIC RECORDING NUMBER(S):133.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2013
  • Docket4184 Order to Show Cause (CRC 3.740(f)) - Comment: Hearing Entered. Calendar Notes: RE: DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2013
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Original Type: Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f); Judicial Officer: Witt, Gary R.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: CONV; Comment: RE: DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2013
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SOW CAUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2013
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: OF NON SERVICE AS TO: CARL R WREN FEE: $74.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2012
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: OF NON SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2012
  • DocketNP1511 - Comment: Department: AL Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PROOF OF SERVICE THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: ATTORNEY GALE MAKES A SPECIAL APPEARANCE FOR ROBERT SCOTT KENNARD ON BEHALF OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. (PL-1). NO APPEARANCE BY DEFENDANT, CARL R. WREN CAUSE CONTINUED TO JANUARY 17, 2013 AT 1:30 PM FOR DISMISSAL ELECTRONIC RECORDING NUMBER(S):2:40.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2012
  • Docket4183 Order to Show Cause - (N23d - CRC 3.740(d)) - Comment: Hearing Entered. Calendar Notes: RE: PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2012
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Original Type: Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d); Judicial Officer: Witt, Gary R.; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Result: CONV; Comment: RE: PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2012
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2012
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service - Comment: ATTEMPTED SERVICE ON CARL R WREN BY JACKIE R BRAZEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2012
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Apr 18, 2013 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT AL OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Apr 18, 2013 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT AL OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2012
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Oct 18, 2012 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT AL OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT OR OBTAIN AN ORDER FOR PUBLICATION WITHIN 180 DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE HAS BEEN FILED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Oct 18, 2012 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT AL OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT OR OBTAIN AN ORDER FOR PUBLICATION WITHIN 180 DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE HAS BEEN FILED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2012
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2012
  • DocketComplaint - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2012
  • Docket843Y Pmt: Ltd Civil Complaint < $10,000 GC 70613(B) - Comment: Amount of $225.00 for CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. (PL-1). Received from LAW OFFC. OF NELSON & KENNARD, check no(s) 301185. Receipt #649246 for amount of $225.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2012
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 431

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Scott Kennard