This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/09/2020 at 21:36:47 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK VS MAGANA

Case Summary

On 09/22/2009 CAPITAL ONE BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MAGANA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Arvin / Lamont Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Witt, Gary R.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5996

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Witt, Gary R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK

Defendant

MAGANA, SERGIO A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BOULANGER, MICHAEL R

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2014
  • DocketWrit Returned Wholly Satisfied - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2014
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Full Satisfaction - Comment: FILED BY MICHAEL KAHN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2012
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: COUNTY: KERN ISSUED: 04/23/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2012
  • Docket115B Pmt: Writs Issued 70626(A)(1) EFF 7/28/09 - Comment: Amount of $25.00 for CAPITAL ONE BANK (PL-1). Received from ELECTRONIC DOCUMENT PROCESSING, check no(s) 262181. Receipt #650817 for amount of $25.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2012
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs - Comment: ACCRUED INTEREST: $975.48

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2010
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Original Type: Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: Witt, Gary R.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment: Calendar Notes: RE: DISMISSAL RE: DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2010
  • DocketHearing Vacated - Comment: JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT FILED ~ calid=1105732 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4184, CourtDate:10/07/2010, Courtroom:AL, SessionNumber:2, Sequence:2, SessionType:OSC, Judge:GRW, Deputy:AMANDAA, SystemDate:9/23/2009 11:46:44 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2010
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Clerk - Comment: TOTAL: $4,814.73 AS TO: SERGIO A MAGANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2010
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2010
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: WAIVER OF ATTORNEY'S FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/02/2010
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: AS TO DOES 1 THROUGH 15, INCLUSIVE ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2009
  • DocketHearing Vacated - Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ~ calid=1105729 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4183, CourtDate:04/01/2010, Courtroom:AL, SessionNumber:2, Sequence:0, SessionType:OSC, Judge:GRW, Deputy:AMANDAA, SystemDate:9/23/2009 11:45:17 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2009
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: WHAT SERVED: SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, STATEMENT OF CLASSIFICATION AND LOCATION, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION NOTICE AND INFORMATION PACKAGE WHO SERVED: SERGIO A MAGANA HOW SERVED: PERSONAL SERVICE DATE SERVED: 10/8/09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2009
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Oct 07, 2010 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT AL OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Oct 07, 2010 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT AL OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2009
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Apr 01, 2010 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT AL OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT OR OBTAIN AN ORDER FOR PUBLICATION WITHIN 180 DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE HAS BEEN FILED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Apr 01, 2010 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT AL OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT OR OBTAIN AN ORDER FOR PUBLICATION WITHIN 180 DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE HAS BEEN FILED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2009
  • Docket843W Pmt: Ltd Civil Complaint < $10,000 GC 70613(B) (7/28/09 - Comment: Amount of $5.00, as partial payment for CAPITAL ONE BANK (PL-1). Received from ELECTRONIC DOCUMENT PROCESSING, check no(s) 202065. Receipt #482085 for fee amount of $5.00. Detail: As of this payment, balance for party PL-1 is as follows: Fee Code 843W: $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2009
  • Docket843W Pmt: Ltd Civil Complaint < $10,000 GC 70613(B) (7/28/09 - Comment: Amount of $200.00, as partial payment for CAPITAL ONE BANK (PL-1). Received from ELECTRONIC DOCUMENT PROCESSING, check no(s) 108624. Receipt #482084 for fee amount of $205.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2009
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: AMANDAA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2009
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2009
  • DocketComplaint - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOULANGER MICHAEL R.