This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 00:17:52 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. VS TROMBLEY

Case Summary

On 04/06/2017 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA , N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against TROMBLEY. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Green, Kenneth R., Jr. and Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0216

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

Defendant

TROMBLEY, CHRISTOPHER P

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JACOBSEN, DEVIN B.

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: EMPLOYER'S RETURN

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F): Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2019
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Full Satisfaction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • DocketWrit Returned Unsatisfied Pursuant to CCP 263.6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • DocketWrit Returned Partially Satisfied Pursuant to CCP 263.6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: EMPLOYER'S RETURN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F): Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - RETURNED VIA MAIL TO HUNT & HENRIQUES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • DocketAbstract Issued - Comment: MAIL-HUNT & HENRIQUES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: LOS ANGELES, MAIL-HUNT & HENRIQUES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.; JACOBSEN, DEVIN B.; Awarded Against: TROMBLEY, CHRISTOPHER P; Amount; Damages: $4,079.42; Costs: $284.50; Total: $4363.92; Party: Names: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.; TROMBLEY, CHRISTOPHER P

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/17/2017
  • DocketDeclaration of Compliance with CCP Section 1033 (B) (2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment - Comment: AS TO CHRISTOPHER P TROMBLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less