This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/20/2018 at 08:24:07 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. VS SWAFFORD

Case Summary

On 12/10/2015 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA , N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SWAFFORD. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Glennon, Donald P., Jr. and Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0211

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ridgecrest Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

Defendant

SWAFFORD, LAURA J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DIPIERO, ANTHONY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.; Awarded Against: SWAFFORD, LAURA J; Amount; Damages: $5,193.11; Pre-Judgment Interest Rate: 0.00 %; Pre-Judgment Interest: $0.00; Attorney Fees: $0.00; Costs: $284.00; Total: $5477.11; Party: Names: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.; SWAFFORD, LAURA J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer(s): Stainfield, Bryan K., Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2016
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • Abstract Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • Judgment by Default by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • Declaration for Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • Request for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2016
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • Statement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.