This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 10:52:49 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. VS SANTANA

Case Summary

On 07/31/2017 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA , N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SANTANA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Shafter / Wasco Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Palmer, William D., Shayer, Steven and Benavides, Jose R.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0212

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Shafter / Wasco Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Palmer, William D.

Shayer, Steven

Benavides, Jose R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

Defendant

SANTANA, SUSANA I

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

POONI, IMINDERJIT JAUR

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Shayer, Steven; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV); Party: Names: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.; SANTANA, SUSANA I

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Palmer, William D.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV); Party: Names: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.; SANTANA, SUSANA I

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less