This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 10:00:55 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. VS REUTTER

Case Summary

On 09/23/2016 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA , N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against REUTTER. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Stainfield, Bryan K., Green, Kenneth R., Jr. and Bittleston, Dawn. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0510

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Stainfield, Bryan K.

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

Bittleston, Dawn

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

Defendant

REUTTER, LORRAINE D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RITTON, JAIME YOSHIMI

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • DocketAbstract Issued - Comment: RETURNED VIA MAIL TO HUNT & HENRIQUES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.; Awarded Against: REUTTER, LORRAINE D; Amount; Damages: $3,303.86; Costs: $282.50; Total: $3586.36; Party: Names: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.; REUTTER, LORRAINE D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: OF COUNSEL RE: INTEREST, COST (CCP 1033) & ATTORNEY FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered - Comment: LORRAINE D REUTTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: Declarastion and Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2016
  • DocketRequest For Entry of Default Not Entered - Comment: For the Following Reason(s): #1a, incorrect.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: for Lorraine D. Reutter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2016
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2016
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RITTON, JAIME Y.