This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 12:56:43 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. VS PATTERSON

Case Summary

On 11/01/2016 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA , N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PATTERSON. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Glennon, Donald P., Jr. and Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0234

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ridgecrest Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

Defendant

PATTERSON, BONNIE L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BLEIER, ELIZABETH

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketWrit Returned Partially Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Full Satisfaction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: KERN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs and Credits

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • DocketAbstract Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.; Awarded Against: PATTERSON, BONNIE L; Amount; Damages: $4,049.87; Costs: $330.00; Total: $4379.87; Party: Names: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.; PATTERSON, BONNIE L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • DocketNon-Military Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/19/2016
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: IN SUPPORT OF ORDER ADMITTING COPIES INTO EVIDENCE IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2016
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2016
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2016
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2016
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less