This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 22:33:18 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. VS OWENS

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA , N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against OWENS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Etienne, Linda S. and Robertson, Murray J.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5927

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Etienne, Linda S.

Robertson, Murray J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

Defendant

OWENS, JOSEPH C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

POONI, IMINDERJIT JAUR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.; Awarded Against: OWENS, JOSEPH C; Amount; Damages: $2,673.73; Costs: $290.00; Total: $2963.73

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Clerk - Comment: AS TO JOSEPH C OWENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • DocketOrder - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: GRANTING USE OF COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • DocketDeclaration of Compliance with CCP Section 1033 (B) (2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • DocketNon-Military Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: STATEMENT OF CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment - Comment: AS TO JOSEPH C OWENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: AS TO JOSEPH C OWENS, SUB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 10/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ABC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less