This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 12:14:09 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. VS NUNEZ

Case Summary

On 08/10/2017 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA , N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against NUNEZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Green, Kenneth R., Jr. and Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0468

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

Defendant

NUNEZ, SARA L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

POONI, IMINDERJIT JAUR

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F): Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F): Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • DocketAbstract Issued - Comment: RETURNED TO PARTY VIA E-FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • DocketDeclaration of Compliance with CCP Section 1033 (B) (2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • DocketStatement - Comment: OF CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: FOR SARA L. NUNEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less