This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 07:17:31 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK, (USA), N.A. VS NORIEL

Case Summary

On 01/03/2020 CAPITAL ONE BANK, USA , N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against NORIEL. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0059

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK, (USA), N.A.

Defendant

NORIEL, ELEANOR C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KENNARD, ROBERT SCOTT

THOMAS, VANESSA A.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F):

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21):

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: CAPITAL ONE BANK, (USA), N.A.; Awarded Against: NORIEL, ELEANOR C; Amount; Damages: $5,090.51; Costs: $310.36; Total: $5400.87

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Clerk - Comment: Against Eleanor C Noriel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: Without prejudice as to Does 1-10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: DECLARATION 1033

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketStatement - Comment: STATEMENT of account

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment - Comment: As to Eleanor C Noriel on complaint filed 1/3/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Eleanor C. Noriel via personal service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 01/07/20208:22 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.