This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 22:32:08 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. VS NOEL

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA , N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against NOEL. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Etienne, Linda S. and Robertson, Murray J.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5926

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Etienne, Linda S.

Robertson, Murray J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

Defendant

NOEL, RAYMOND

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

POONI, IMINDERJIT JAUR

 

Court Documents

Ruling

Ruling: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered; Comment: crc 3.1385

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Notice of Settlement Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Stipulated Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • DocketJudgment (After Conditional Settlement) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: STIPULATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketDeclaration for Default - Comment: in Support of Entry of Judgment Pursuant to Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketStipulation - Comment: settlement agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Notice of Settlement Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • DocketNotice of Settlement Conditional (JBSIS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ABC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less