This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 22:31:29 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. VS JOSLIN

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA , N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JOSLIN. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Green, Kenneth R., Jr. and Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0628

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

Defendant

JOSLIN, CHRISTOPHER D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JACOBSEN, DEVIN B.

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: 2 DECLARATION'S, ORDER, MEMORANDUM OF COST AND JUDGMENT

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT, SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT, ORDER & DISMISSAL

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F): Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: 2 DECLARATION'S, ORDER, MEMORANDUM OF COST AND JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • DocketNotice of Intent - Comment: to request Entry of Judment under Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F): Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Notice of Settlement Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • DocketOrder on Settlement Agreement & Stipulation (JBSIS) - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • DocketConfidential Document - Comment: MEMO TO JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: CCP 664.6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • DocketAgreement - Comment: SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • DocketNotice of Settlement Conditional (JBSIS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT, SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT, ORDER & DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: as to Christopher D. Joslin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less