This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 23:47:36 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. VS HIGAREDA

Case Summary

On 03/30/2017 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HIGAREDA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Green, Kenneth R., Jr. and Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0208

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A.

Defendant

HIGAREDA, GONZALO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHERRILL, DONALD

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f)

NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 3.740(f): Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d)

NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 3.740(d): Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: DECLARATION & JUDGMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2019
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Full Satisfaction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 3.740(f): Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 3.740(d): Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: COUNTY OF KERN-RETURNED VIA MAIL TO HUNT & HENRIQUES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • DocketAbstract Issued - Comment: BY MAIL- HUNT & HENRIQUES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A.; Awarded Against: HIGAREDA, GONZALO; Amount; Damages: $4,955.15; Costs: $284.50; Total: $5239.65; Party: Names: HIGAREDA, GONZALO; CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • DocketDeclaration of Compliance with CCP Section 1033 (B) (2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment - Comment: AGAINST GONZALO HIGAREDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: DECLARATION & JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • DocketRequest For Entry of Default Not Entered - Comment: For the Following Reason(s): #1.A IS INCORRECT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: FOR GONZALO HIGAREDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service - Comment: FOR GONZALO HIGAREDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less