This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 01:33:38 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. VS GUAJARDO

Case Summary

On 04/24/2017 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA , N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GUAJARDO. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Delano / Mcfarland Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Tafoya, Robert S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0111

  • Filing Date:

    04/24/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delano / Mcfarland Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Tafoya, Robert S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

Defendant

GUAJARDO, ADRIENNE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MOORE, HARVEY M

GARVEY, MATTHEW S

HAYDEN, AMARA

MCDONALD, KRISTEN L.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.; Awarded Against: GUAJARDO, ADRIENNE; Amount; Damages: $4,728.88; Costs: $290.00; Total: $5018.88; Party: Names: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.; GUAJARDO, ADRIENNE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • DocketDeclaration of Compliance with CCP Section 1033 (B) (2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • DocketStatement - Comment: of Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.; Served: 09/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less