Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/30/2020 at 18:40:05 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. VS ESPINOZA

Case Summary

On 01/30/2015 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA , N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ESPINOZA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Shafter / Wasco Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Camacho, Marcos R. and Errea, Larry A.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9301

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Shafter / Wasco Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Camacho, Marcos R.

Errea, Larry A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

Defendant

ESPINOZA, ELMO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KENNARD, ROBERT SCOTT

Attorney at NELSON & KENNARD

Nelson & Kennard Po Box 13807

Sacramento, CA 95853

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2018
  • DocketWrit Returned Unsatisfied - Comment: LOS ANGELES COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: LOS ANGELES COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • DocketMemorandum of Credits, Interest and Costs Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • DocketMemorandum of Credits, Interest and Costs Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2015
  • DocketAbstract Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2015
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Camacho, Marcos R.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.; Awarded Against: ESPINOZA, ELMO; Amount; Damages: $2,944.64; Costs: $299.50; Total: $3244.14; Party: Names: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.; ESPINOZA, ELMO; Comment: Comment ()

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2015
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: RE: Research to determine military status of defendant(s); Notice pursuant to C.C.P 1033(b)(2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2015
  • DocketStatement - Comment: Of Account

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2015
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2015
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment - Comment: As to Elmo Espinoza

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2015
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: Does 1 to 10, only without prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2015
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO ELMO ESPINOZA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2015
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Jan 15, 2016 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT BS OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Jan 15, 2016 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT BS OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2015
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Jul 31, 2015 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT BS OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT OR OBTAIN AN ORDER FOR PUBLICATION WITHIN 180 DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE HAS BEEN FILED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Jul 31, 2015 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT BS OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT OR OBTAIN AN ORDER FOR PUBLICATION WITHIN 180 DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE HAS BEEN FILED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2015
  • Docket843Y Pmt: Ltd Civil Complaint < $10,000 GC 70613(B) - Comment: Amount of $225.00 for CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. (PL-1). Received from LAW OFFICES OF NELSON & KENNAR, check no(s) 466235. Receipt #821511 for amount of $225.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2015
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2015
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2015
  • DocketComplaint - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Scott Kennard